Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 12/16/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 12/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 12/16/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/31/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/31/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/28/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/26/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/27/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/11/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/17/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/17/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 05/17/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/23/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/23/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/12/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/14/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 06/14/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/26/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/26/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/28/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/29/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/10/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/10/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/10/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/11/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/12/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 07/13/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/18/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 07/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/27/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/27/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/06/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/06/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/07/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/07/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/07/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/12/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/13/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/13/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/13/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 09/13/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/14/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/19/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/19/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/20/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/20/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/25/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/26/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/26/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/27/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/27/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/28/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 09/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/28/2006
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/29/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/29/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/29/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 09/29/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/13/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 11/15/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/15/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/15/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 12/05/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 12/05/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 12/05/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/05/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 12/05/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/05/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/05/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/05/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 12/05/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/06/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/06/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 12/06/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/06/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 12/06/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 12/06/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 12/06/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 12/06/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/06/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/06/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/06/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 12/06/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 12/06/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 12/06/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 12/08/2006