Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/08/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/02/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/03/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/16/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/16/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/17/2006