Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 12/17/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/17/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 12/18/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 12/18/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/01/2006
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/01/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 02/14/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/15/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/07/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/29/2006