Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 12/22/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 12/22/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 12/22/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 12/22/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 12/22/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 12/22/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/03/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/29/2006