Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 01/03/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/03/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/03/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/03/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/03/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 01/03/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/01/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/01/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/01/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/07/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/07/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/07/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 02/07/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/07/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/14/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/25/2006