Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/01/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/07/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/14/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/14/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/06/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/28/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/30/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/26/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/23/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/19/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/24/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/13/2006