Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 02/01/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/01/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/01/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/14/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/16/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/02/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/07/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/28/2006