Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 02/01/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/08/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/08/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/08/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/08/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/08/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/08/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/15/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/25/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/09/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/09/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/16/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/16/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/16/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/16/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/23/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/12/2006