Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/20/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/01/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/08/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/08/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/14/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 02/15/2005
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/07/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/07/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/07/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/14/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/17/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/06/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/18/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 04/18/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/18/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 04/18/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 04/18/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/18/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 04/26/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 05/09/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/09/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/09/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 05/09/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 05/09/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/23/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/23/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/23/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/23/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/23/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/08/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 06/21/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/21/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/24/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/24/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/24/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 07/11/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/11/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/11/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 07/11/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/11/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/19/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/19/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/07/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 02/01/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/28/2006