Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/07/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/07/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/08/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/08/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/08/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/14/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/14/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/02/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/07/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/15/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/15/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/15/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/30/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/25/2006
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 04/25/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/22/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/24/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 07/24/2006