Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/15/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/14/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/14/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/18/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/18/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/09/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/18/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/24/2006