Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 02/28/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/16/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/16/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/10/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/08/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/08/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 06/08/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/08/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 06/08/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 06/08/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/12/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/12/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/12/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/15/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 06/16/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 06/21/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 06/21/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/21/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 06/21/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 06/21/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/21/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 06/21/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/21/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/21/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/21/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/21/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/26/2006