Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/16/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/13/2006