Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/15/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/07/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/14/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/14/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/04/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/04/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/04/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/04/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/04/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/02/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/02/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/02/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/19/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/13/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/06/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/15/2006