Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/08/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/15/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/15/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/15/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/01/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/15/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/15/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/16/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2006