Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/16/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/09/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/13/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/04/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 04/04/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/04/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 04/04/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 04/04/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/02/2006
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/17/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 09/06/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 09/12/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/20/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/21/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/21/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/25/2006
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/25/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2006