There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 35, United States Code, to allow the Director of the Patent and Trademark Office to waive statutory provisions governing patents and trademarks in certain emergencies.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/05/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8685-8686)
04/05/2006Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-408.
02/14/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
12/06/2006SenateReceived in the Senate.
12/05/2006-11:23amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/05/2006-11:23amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8685-8686)
12/05/2006-11:19amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4742.
12/05/2006-11:19amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8685-8686)
12/05/2006-11:18amHouseMr. Sensenbrenner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
04/05/2006HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 223.
04/05/2006HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 109-408.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/15/2006HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/15/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/01/2006HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property
03/01/2006HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property
02/28/2006HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
02/14/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
02/14/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/14/2006

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/14/2006 Referred to
03/15/2006 Markup by
04/05/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-408
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, the Internet, and Intellectual Property02/28/2006 Referred to
03/01/2006 Markup by
03/01/2006 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4742.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4742. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (12/05/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Allows the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office (USPTO) to waive statutory provisions governing the filing, processing, renewal, and maintenance of patents, trademark registrations, and applications for patents or registrations to the extent necessary to protect the rights and privileges of applicants and other persons affected by an emergency or a major disaster. Disallows judicial review of any decision not to exercise such waiver authority.