Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/28/2006
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/07/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/07/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/07/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/09/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/15/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/15/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/15/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/17/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/17/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/17/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/17/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/17/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/17/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/17/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/17/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/22/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/22/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 05/22/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/22/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/22/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/22/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/22/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/22/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/22/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/23/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/23/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/23/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/23/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/23/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/23/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/06/2006
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/06/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/06/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/06/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/15/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/15/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/15/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/20/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/20/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/10/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/10/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/10/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 07/10/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/17/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/17/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/17/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/20/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/20/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/06/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/06/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/06/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/06/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/06/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/07/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/13/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/13/2006