Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/01/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/01/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/09/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/17/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/17/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/09/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/09/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/17/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/06/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/28/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/05/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/05/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/09/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 06/09/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/17/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/12/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/06/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/26/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/26/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/10/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/16/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/16/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/29/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/29/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/05/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/18/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/09/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/19/2006
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/29/2006