Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/14/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/14/2006
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/14/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/01/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/01/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/07/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/14/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/10/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/10/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/10/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 05/17/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 05/17/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/23/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/25/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/29/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/29/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/29/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/29/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/10/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/10/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/10/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/10/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/10/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/12/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/20/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/07/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/07/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/07/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 09/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/13/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/13/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/13/2006
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/13/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 09/19/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/19/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/21/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/21/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/29/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 09/29/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/05/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 12/05/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 12/06/2006