Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/15/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/15/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/15/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/16/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/16/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 02/16/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/16/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 02/16/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/01/2006
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/01/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/01/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/01/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/02/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 03/02/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/07/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/07/2006
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/09/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/09/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/09/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/09/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/09/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/09/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/09/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/15/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/15/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/15/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/15/2006
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/15/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/15/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/28/2006
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 03/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/29/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/30/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/04/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 04/05/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/05/2006
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/06/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/06/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/06/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/06/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/26/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/26/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/27/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/27/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/03/2006
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/03/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 05/03/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/04/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/04/2006
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/09/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/10/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/10/2006
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/10/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/19/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/24/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/25/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/25/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/25/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/25/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 06/08/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/08/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/13/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/16/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/16/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/21/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/22/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/26/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/26/2006