Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/14/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-394.
12/14/2006 Signed by President.
12/11/2006 Presented to President.
12/06/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/06/2006 Senate Committee on Indian Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR 12/7/2006 S11387)
09/27/2006 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7609-7610)
02/15/2006 Introduced in House