Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 02/15/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 07/26/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 09/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/26/2006