Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/01/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/03/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/03/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/03/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/03/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/03/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/14/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/14/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/14/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/14/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/14/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/27/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/08/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 06/08/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/08/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/08/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/08/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/08/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/08/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/08/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/08/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/08/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/21/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/12/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/12/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/12/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/28/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/08/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/08/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/08/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/09/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/09/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/09/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/28/2006