Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/07/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/07/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 03/07/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/13/2006