Text: H.R.479 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-355 (10/16/2006)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 355]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ355.109]

[[Page 120 STAT. 2018]]

Public Law 109-355
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To replace a Coastal Barrier Resources System map relating to Coastal 
  Barrier Resources System Grayton Beach Unit FL-95P in Walton County, 
             Florida. <<NOTE: Oct. 16, 2006 -  [H.R. 479]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. <<NOTE: 16 USC 3503 note.>> REPLACEMENT OF COASTAL 
                              BARRIER RESOURCES SYSTEM MAP 
                              RELATING TO GRAYTON BEACH UNIT FL-
                              95P IN WALTON COUNTY, FLORIDA.

    (a) In General.--The map described in subsection (b) relating to the 
Coastal Barrier Resources System unit Grayton Beach Unit FL-95P, located 
in Walton County, Florida, as included in the set of maps entitled 
``Coastal Barrier Resources System'' referred to in section 4(a) of the 
Coastal Barrier Resources Act (16 U.S.C. 3503(a)), is hereby replaced by 
another map relating to that unit entitled ``Grayton Beach Unit FL-95P 
and Draper Lake Unit FL-96'' and dated ``July 24, 2006''.
    (b) Replaced Map Described.--The map replaced under subsection (a) 
is subtitled ``COASTAL BARRIER RESOURCES SYSTEM GRAYTON BEACH UNIT FL-
95P DRAPER LAKE UNIT FL-96'' and dated October 24, 1990.
    (c) Availability.--The Secretary of the Interior shall keep the maps 
referred to in subsections (a) on file and available for inspection in 
accordance with the provisions of section 4(b) of the Coastal Barrier 
Resources Act (16 U.S.C. 3503(b)).

    Approved October 16, 2006.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 479:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 109-620 (Comm. on Resources).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 152 (2006):
            Sept. 12, considered and passed House.
            Sept. 29, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>