Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/16/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/28/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/28/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 02/28/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 02/28/2006
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/02/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/02/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/02/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/08/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/08/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/08/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/08/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 04/06/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/06/2006