Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/01/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/01/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/01/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/01/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/01/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/01/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/02/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/02/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/02/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/02/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/02/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/07/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/07/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/07/2006
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/07/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/07/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/15/2006