There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 215 West Industrial Park Road in Harrison, Arkansas, as the "John Paul Hammerschmidt Post Office Building".


Actions Overview (7)

Date
08/17/2006Became Public Law No: 109-274. (TXT | PDF)
08/17/2006Signed by President.
08/14/2006Presented to President.
08/02/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8667-8668)
08/01/2006Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
05/02/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1928)
02/28/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber
08/17/2006Became Public Law No: 109-274. (TXT | PDF)
08/17/2006Signed by President.
08/14/2006HousePresented to President.
08/03/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
08/02/2006SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8667-8668)
08/01/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
08/01/2006SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
07/27/2006SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs
05/03/2006SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
05/02/2006-2:39pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
05/02/2006-2:38pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1928)
05/02/2006-2:25pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 4811.
05/02/2006-2:25pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1928-1930)
05/02/2006-2:25pmHouseMs. Foxx moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
03/30/2006HouseOrdered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
03/30/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Government Reform
02/28/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on Government Reform.
02/28/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (116)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 02/28/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 02/28/2006

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Government Reform02/28/2006 Referred to
03/30/2006 Markup by
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/03/2006 Referred to
07/27/2006 Markup by
08/01/2006 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.4811.


Subjects (9)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.4811. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-274 (08/17/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 215 West Industrial Park Road in Harrison, Arkansas, as the "John Paul Hammerschmidt Post Office Building."