There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Security Improvement Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Defense Production Act of 1950 to improve national security and clarify congressional intent with respect to the review process for certain mergers and acquisitions, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/28/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/21/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
03/17/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
02/28/2006Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2006Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2006Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2006Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and International Relations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/28/2006Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/28/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 02/28/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/01/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/02/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/02/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/07/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/07/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/09/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/29/2006

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services02/28/2006 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Domestic and International Monetary Policy, Trade, and Technology03/21/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce02/28/2006 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Commerce, Trade and Consumer Protection03/17/2006 Referred to
House International Relations02/28/2006 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.4813.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.4813. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/28/2006)

United States Security Improvement Act of 2006 - Amends the Defense Production Act of 1950 to state that the purpose of a mandatory investigation of a proposed corporate merger, acquisition, or takeover (transaction) undertaken under such Act is to determine whether the acquisition could affect U.S. national security. Directs the President, within five days after initiating a mandatory investigation, to notify each House of Congress of the transaction being investigated. Requires such notice to be promptly transmitted to specified congressional committees. Prohibits the President from taking any action regarding a transaction under investigation until 14 days after congressional notification. Requires the President to consider and take into account any comments on the transaction provided by any congressional committee.