Text: H.R.482 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-474 (01/12/2007)

 
[109th Congress Public Law 474]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ474.109]

[[Page 3561]]

                     PINE SPRINGS LAND EXCHANGE ACT

[[Page 120 STAT. 3562]]

Public Law 109-474
109th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To provide for a land exchange involving Federal lands in the Lincoln 
       National Forest in the State of New Mexico, and for other 
            purposes. <<NOTE: Jan. 12, 2007 -  [H.R. 482]>> 

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled, <<NOTE: Pine Springs 
Land Exchange Act.>> 

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Pine Springs Land Exchange Act''.

SEC. 2. DEFINITIONS.

    In this Act:
            (1) Federal land.--The term ``Federal land'' means the 3 
        parcels of Forest land (including any improvements on the land), 
        comprising approximately 80 acres, as depicted on the map.
            (2) Forest.--The term ``Forest'' means the Lincoln National 
        Forest in the State of New Mexico.
            (3) Map.--The term ``map'' means the map entitled ``Pine 
        Springs Land Exchange'' and dated May 25, 2004.
            (4) Non-federal land.--The term ``non-Federal land'' means 
        the parcel of University land comprising approximately 80 acres, 
        as depicted on the map.
            (5) Secretary.--The term ``Secretary'' means the Secretary 
        of Agriculture.
            (6) University.--The term ``University'' means Lubbock 
        Christian University in the State of New Mexico.

SEC. 3. LAND EXCHANGE.

    (a) In General.--In <<NOTE: Lubbock Christian University.>> exchange 
for the conveyance to the Secretary of the non-Federal land by the 
University, the Secretary shall convey to the University, by quitclaim 
deed, all right, title, and interest of the United States in and to the 
Federal land.

    (b) Map.--
            (1) Availability of map.--The map shall be on file and 
        available for inspection in--
                    (A) the Office of the Chief of the Forest Service; 
                and
                    (B) the Office of the Supervisor of Lincoln National 
                Forest.
            (2) Minor errors.--The Secretary and the University may 
        correct any minor errors in the map.

SEC. 4. EXCHANGE TERMS AND CONDITIONS.

    (a) In General.--The conveyance of Federal land under section 3(a) 
shall be subject to--
            (1) any valid existing rights; and

[[Page 120 STAT. 3563]]

            (2) any additional terms and conditions that the Secretary 
        determines to be appropriate to protect the interests of the 
        United States.

    (b) Acceptable Title.--Title to the non-Federal land shall--
            (1) conform with the title approval standards of the 
        Attorney General applicable to Federal land acquisitions; and
            (2) otherwise be acceptable to the Secretary.

    (c) Compliance With Federal Land Policy and Management Act.--The 
land exchange authorized under section 3(a) shall be carried out in 
accordance with section 206 of the Federal Land Policy and Management 
Act of 1976 (43 U.S.C. 1716).
    (d) Costs.--The costs of carrying out the exchange of Federal land 
and non-Federal land shall be shared equally by the Secretary and the 
University.

SEC. 5. MISCELLANEOUS PROVISIONS.

    (a) Revocation and Withdrawal.--
            (1) Revocation of orders.--Any public orders withdrawing any 
        of the Federal land from appropriation or disposal under the 
        public land laws are revoked to the extent necessary to permit 
        disposal of the Federal land in accordance with this Act.
            (2) Withdrawal of federal land.--Subject to valid existing 
        rights, pending the completion of the land exchange under 
        section 3(a), the Federal land is withdrawn from all forms of 
        location, entry, and patent under the public land laws, 
        including--
                    (A) the mining and mineral leasing laws; and
                    (B) the Geothermal Steam Act of 1970 (30 U.S.C. 1001 
                et seq.).

    (b) Administration of Land Acquired by the United States.--
            (1) Boundary adjustment.--On acceptance of title by the 
        Secretary to the non-Federal land--
                    (A) the non-Federal land shall become part of the 
                Forest; and
                    (B) the boundaries of the Forest shall be adjusted 
                to include the acquired land.
            (2) Land and water conservation fund.--For purposes of 
        section 7 of the Land and Water Conservation Fund Act of 1965 
        (16 U.S.C. 460l-9), the boundaries of the Forest, as modified 
        under paragraph (1), shall be considered to be boundaries of the 
        Forest as of January 1, 1965.
            (3) Management.--The Secretary shall manage the non-Federal 
        land acquired under section 3(a) in accordance with--
                    (A) the Act of March 1, 1911 (commonly known as the 
                ``Weeks Law'') (16 U.S.C. 480 et seq.); and
                    (B) any other laws (including regulations) 
                applicable to National Forest System land.

[[Page 120 STAT. 3564]]

    (c) Duties of Secretary.--In exercising any discretion necessary to 
carry out this Act, the Secretary shall ensure that the public interest 
is well served.

    Approved January 12, 2007.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 482:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

SENATE REPORTS: No. 109-312 (Comm. on Energy and Natural Resources).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD:
                                                        Vol. 151 (2005):
                                    Apr. 12, considered and passed 
                                        House.
                                                        Vol. 152 (2006):
                                    Dec. 7, considered and passed 
                                        Senate, amended.
                                    Dec. 8, House concurred in Senate 
                                        amendment.

                                  <all>