Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/01/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/09/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/17/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/27/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/06/2006