There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate a United States courthouse in Brownsville, Texas, as the "Reynaldo G. Garza and Filemon B. Vela United States Courthouse".


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
06/29/2005Became Public Law No: 109-16. (TXT | PDF)
06/29/2005Signed by President.
06/21/2005Presented to President.
06/15/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6667)
06/09/2005Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
04/13/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H1905)
02/01/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/29/2005Became Public Law No: 109-16. (TXT | PDF)
06/29/2005Signed by President.
06/21/2005HousePresented to President.
06/16/2005SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/15/2005SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6667)
06/09/2005SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
06/09/2005SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Inhofe without amendment. Without written report.
06/08/2005SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/14/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
04/13/2005-10:54amHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/13/2005-10:54amHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H1905)
04/13/2005-10:40amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 483.
04/13/2005-10:40amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1905-1907)
04/13/2005-10:39amHouseMr. Shuster moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/02/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
02/01/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
02/01/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (9)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure02/01/2005 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management02/02/2005 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works04/14/2005 Referred to
06/08/2005 Markup by
06/09/2005 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.483.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.483. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-16 (06/29/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Designates the U.S. courthouse at the corner of Seventh Street and East Jackson Street in Brownsville, Texas, as the "Reynaldo G. Garza and Filemon B. Vela United States Courthouse."