Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/01/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/09/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 04/26/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/09/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/25/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/26/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/29/2006