There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Federal Election Integrity Act of 2006

Short Titles as Reported to House

Federal Election Integrity Act of 2006

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Election Integrity Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

To amend the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to require each individual who desires to vote in an election for Federal office to provide the appropriate election official with a government-issued photo identification, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the National Voter Registration Act of 1993 to require any individual who desires to register or re-register to vote in an election for Federal office to provide the appropriate State election official with proof that the individual is a citizen of the United States to prevent fraud in Federal elections, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/20/2006Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 196 (Roll no. 459).(text: CR H6765)
09/19/2006Reported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 109-666.
03/02/2006Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/13/2006SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration.
09/21/2006SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/20/2006-3:59pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2006-3:59pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2006-3:59pmHouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 228 - 196 (Roll no. 459). (text: CR H6765)
09/20/2006-3:50pmHouseOn motion to recommit with instructions Failed by the Yeas and Nays: 196 - 225 (Roll no. 458).
09/20/2006-3:24pmHouseThe previous question on the motion to recommit with instructions was ordered without objection. (consideration: CR H6784-6785; text: CR H6782-6783)
09/20/2006-3:16pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Millender-McDonald motion to recommit with instuctions. The instructions contained in the motion seek to require the bill to be reported back to the House with an amendment in the nature of a substitute entitled "Federal Election Integrity Act of 2006" which inserts a complete new text.
09/20/2006-3:15pmHouseMs. Millender-McDonald moved to recommit with instructions to House Administration.
09/20/2006-3:15pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6782)
09/20/2006-1:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 4844.
09/20/2006-1:45pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 4844 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on House Administration now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted.
09/20/2006-1:45pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1015. (consideration: CR H6765-6785)
09/20/2006-1:11pmHouseRule H. Res. 1015 passed House.
09/19/2006-7:43pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1015 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 4844 with 1 hour of general debate. Previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except motion to recommit with or without instructions. Measure will be considered read. Bill is closed to amendments. The amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on House Administration now printed in the bill shall be considered as adopted.
09/19/2006HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 397.
09/19/2006HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on House Administration. H. Rept. 109-666.
09/14/2006HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 4 - 3.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
09/14/2006HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on House Administration
03/02/2006HouseReferred to the House Committee on House Administration.
03/02/2006HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (11)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Committee on House Administration03/02/2006 Referred to
09/14/2006 Markup by
09/19/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-666
Senate Rules and Administration11/13/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.4844. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (09/20/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on September 19, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Federal Election Integrity Act of 2006 - (Sec. 2) Amends the Help America Vote Act of 2002 to prohibit the appropriate state or local election official from providing a federal election ballot to an individual who desires to vote in person unless the individual presents to the official: (1) a government-issued, current, and valid photo identification (ID); or (2) for regularly scheduled federal general elections held in November 2010 and subsequent years, a government-issued, current, and valid photo ID for which the individual was required to provide proof of U.S. citizenship as a condition for issuance of the ID.

Requires an individual who does not present such an ID to be permitted to cast a provisional ballot in such an election. Requires such individual, however, to present the required ID within 48 hours after casting the provisional ballot, or the appropriate state or local election official may not determine the individual's eligibility to vote.

Requires individuals who vote other than in person in a federal election (for example, by mail) to submit a copy of such a photo ID with a ballot, or the appropriate official may not accept the ballot. Exempts from this requirement the absentee ballot of any eligible overseas military voter absent from the United States by reason of active duty or service.

(Sec. 3) Requires states to establish a program to provide photo IDs in accordance with this Act to individuals who desire to vote but do not otherwise possess a government-issued photo ID.

Provides that, if a state charges a fee for providing such a photo ID, the fee: (1) may not exceed the reasonable cost to the state of providing the ID; and (2) may not be charged to any individual who provides an attestation that the individual is unable to afford the fee.

Prohibits the use of any such photo IDs for any state or local government program or function other than election administration.

Requires the Election Assistance Commission to make payments to states to cover the costs incurred in providing photo IDs to individuals unable to afford the fee that would otherwise be charged.

Authorizes appropriations for FY2008 and following fiscal years.