Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/08/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 03/08/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/04/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/26/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 06/29/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/06/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/13/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/13/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/19/2006