Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/11/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/11/2006