Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/02/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/02/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/02/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/02/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/09/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/09/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/16/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/16/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/16/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/16/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/16/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/16/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/16/2006
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/16/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/16/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/28/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/28/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/06/2006
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 04/26/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/04/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/10/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/18/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/26/2006