Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/09/2006
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/17/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/18/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/12/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/22/2006
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 06/27/2006
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/28/2006
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/12/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/17/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/24/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/25/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 07/25/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/28/2006
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3] 07/28/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/06/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 09/06/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/06/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/12/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/25/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/26/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/05/2006