Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/07/2006
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/08/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/08/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/08/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/09/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 03/16/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/16/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew