Committees: H.R.4890 — 109th Congress (2005-2006)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Budget03/07/2006 Referred to
06/08/2006 Hearings by
06/14/2006 Markup by
06/16/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-505,Part 1
House Rules03/07/2006 Referred to
03/15/2006 Hearings by
06/15/2006 Markup by
06/19/2006 Reported by H. Rept. 109-505,Part 2