Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/07/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/08/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/08/2006
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/08/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 03/08/2006
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/08/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/08/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/08/2006
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/08/2006
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/08/2006
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/08/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/08/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 03/08/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/08/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/09/2006
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/09/2006
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/09/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/09/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/09/2006
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/09/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/14/2006
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/14/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/14/2006
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/14/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/14/2006
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/14/2006
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/16/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/16/2006
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/16/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/29/2006
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/04/2006
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 04/04/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/06/2006
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/26/2006
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/22/2006
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/12/2006
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2006
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/14/2006
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/19/2006