Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/05/2006
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/05/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/25/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/25/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/25/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/26/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/02/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/03/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/03/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/09/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/10/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2006
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 05/16/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 05/18/2006
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/19/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/19/2006
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/19/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/19/2006
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/23/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/23/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 05/23/2006
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/24/2006
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 05/25/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/06/2006
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/06/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/06/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 06/07/2006
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 06/07/2006
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/07/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/08/2006
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 06/08/2006
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/09/2006
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7] 06/09/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/12/2006