Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 03/07/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/30/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/30/2006
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/30/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/30/2006
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/30/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/05/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/05/2006
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/18/2006