Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/06/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 06/06/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/2006
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/25/2006
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/25/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/25/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/25/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/25/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/26/2006