Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/08/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/18/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/19/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/21/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/29/2006