Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/16/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/07/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 06/07/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/28/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 07/24/2006