Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/25/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/25/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/25/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/15/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/18/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/07/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/20/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/27/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/28/2006