Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/09/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 05/03/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/03/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/23/2006
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-3] 05/23/2006
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/21/2006
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/27/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/27/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/27/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/27/2006
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/27/2006
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/27/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/27/2006
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/27/2006
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/27/2006
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 06/27/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/28/2006
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/28/2006
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/28/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/28/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/29/2006
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/29/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/29/2006
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 06/29/2006
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/29/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/29/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/11/2006
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/11/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 07/11/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/11/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/11/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 07/11/2006
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/11/2006
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 07/24/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 07/24/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/24/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/24/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/24/2006
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/26/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/26/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/26/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/27/2006
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/28/2006
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/12/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/12/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/21/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/14/2006