Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/29/2006
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/10/2006
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/10/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/12/2006
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/24/2006
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/07/2006